OK HB2369 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2369
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; creating the Criminal Justice Coordinating Commission; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; creating the Criminal Justice Coordinating Commission; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 70 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 70 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2019-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2019-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Jech, Daniels, Bice, Coleman, Brooks, Floyd, Shaw, Matthews |
2019-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5 |
2019-03-13 | House | Ayes: 70 Nays: 11 |
2019-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2369 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Enacting clause restored