OK HB2336 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2336

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; authorizing handgun licensees to carry on school property under certain circumstances; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; authorizing handgun licensees to carry on school property under certain circumstances; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseSA's received
2020-02-13SenateEngrossed to House
2020-02-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-02-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
2020-02-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2020-02-12Senatecoauthored by Luttrell
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 25
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
2019-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2336 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback