OK HB2314 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2314

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Liens; modifying time for resubmission of title application; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liens; modifying time for resubmission of title application; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services & Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02HouseApproved by Governor 05/02/2017
2017-04-26HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-26HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-04-25HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-04-25SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2017-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-04-11SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2017-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-02-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-02-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2017-02-13HouseAuthored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
2017-02-13HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-08HouseCR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2314 (Carry Over) 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2017

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback