OK HB2312 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2312
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; driving on roadways; use of the left-hand lane; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; driving on roadways; use of the left-hand lane; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] |
Sen. Ervin Yen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 18 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 18 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2017 |
2017-05-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Public Safety committee |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Yen |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2017-03-07 | House | Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey, Caldwell |
2017-03-07 | House | General Order |
2017-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2312 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017