OK HB2308 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2308
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; motor license agents; cameras; Internet services; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; motor license agents; cameras; Internet services; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Davis |
2021-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-10 | House | Amended |
2021-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2021-03-10 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2308 (Carry Over) 2021-04-05 - Referred to Appropriations