OK HB2307 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2307
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Driver licenses; motor agent's office hours; modifying hours of operations; requiring at least one agent office be open per county; effective date; emergency.
Title
Driver licenses; motor agent's office hours; modifying hours of operations; requiring at least one agent office be open per county; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] | Rep. Kenton Patzkowsky [R] |
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2019-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2019-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2019-05-21 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 40; Ayes: 69 Nays: 24 |
2019-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | Emergency restored |
2019-05-17 | House | Title restored |
2019-05-17 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Standridge, Shaw, Rader, Jech, Brooks, Matthews |
2019-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Transportation |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Emergency added |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Amended |
2019-03-05 | House | Remove Senator Bergstrom as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Standridge |
2019-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Patzkowsky, Kerbs |
2019-03-05 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-14 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Frix |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2307 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019