OK HB2307 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Driver licenses; motor agent's office hours; modifying hours of operations; requiring at least one agent office be open per county; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver licenses; motor agent's office hours; modifying hours of operations; requiring at least one agent office be open per county; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-21SenateCCR read
2019-05-21HouseTo Senate
2019-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 40; Ayes: 69 Nays: 24
2019-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-17HouseEmergency restored
2019-05-17HouseTitle restored
2019-05-17HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named Standridge, Shaw, Rader, Jech, Brooks, Matthews
2019-05-01HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-04-25SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-25SenateEmergency added
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-03SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-03SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-01SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-01SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-04-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
2019-03-05HouseAmended
2019-03-05HouseRemove Senator Bergstrom as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Standridge
2019-03-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Patzkowsky, Kerbs
2019-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
2019-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-02-14HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Frix
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2307&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2307%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2307%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2307%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2307%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2307%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2307%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB2307%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2307%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2307_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2307_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback