OK HB2303 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption for forestry equipment; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption for forestry equipment; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseCCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
2019-05-02SenateConference granted, GCCA
2019-04-23HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
2019-04-17HouseSA's received
2019-04-17SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-16SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 3
2019-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-02SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-02SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 3
2019-03-11HouseAmended
2019-03-11HouseAuthored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
2019-03-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McBride
2019-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseTitle stricken
2019-02-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin)
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-18HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Tadlock
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback