OK HB2303 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2303
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Conference granted, SCs named Bullard, Bice, Hall, Rosino, Floyd, Kirt
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Conference granted, SCs named Bullard, Bice, Hall, Rosino, Floyd, Kirt
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption for forestry equipment; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption for forestry equipment; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Bullard, Bice, Hall, Rosino, Floyd, Kirt |
2020-02-04 | House | SAs rejected, further conference requested, naming GCCA |
2019-05-16 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2019-04-23 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2019-04-17 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 3 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 3 |
2019-03-11 | House | Amended |
2019-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Title stricken |
2019-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin) |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Tadlock |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2303 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree