OK HB2296 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2296
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemptions; use tax exemptions; certain veterans; certain exclusion from maximum amount; certain usage limitation; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemptions; use tax exemptions; certain veterans; certain exclusion from maximum amount; certain usage limitation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2296 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee