OK HB2291 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2291
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial bridges; designating the Lt. Gen. Thomas P. Stafford Memorial Interchange; effective date.
Title
Memorial bridges; designating the Lt. Gen. Thomas P. Stafford Memorial Interchange; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Green; authored by Senator Jech |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 |
2023-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-22 | House | Amended |
2023-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Green (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-22 | House | General Order |
2023-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2291 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation