OK HB2265 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; modifying components of the Oklahoma Teacher and Leader Effectiveness Evaluation System; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; modifying components of the Oklahoma Teacher and Leader Effectiveness Evaluation System; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Cannaday |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |