OK HB2262 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government assets; Long Range Capital Planning Commission; Maintenance of State Buildings Revolving Fund; effective date; emergency.
Title
State government assets; Long Range Capital Planning Commission; Maintenance of State Buildings Revolving Fund; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Approved by Governor 04/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-17 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-17 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2012-04-17 | Title restored | |
2012-04-17 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-05 | First Reading | |
2012-03-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-01 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Shannon | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |