OK HB2244 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; modifying eligibility criteria for alternative placement teaching certification; effective date.
Title
Schools; modifying eligibility criteria for alternative placement teaching certification; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Marian Cooksey [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Jim Halligan [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Approved by Governor 04/17/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-20 | coauthored by Shelton | |
2012-03-20 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2012-02-14 | First Reading | |
2012-02-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 | |
2012-02-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Cooksey | |
2012-02-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-07 | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2012-02-07 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Denney | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |