OK HB2243 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2243
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying list of vehicles exempted from odometer disclosure statements; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying list of vehicles exempted from odometer disclosure statements; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 05/02/2023 |
2023-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Dobrinski |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2243 (Carry Over) 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023