OK HB2243 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2243

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; modifying list of vehicles exempted from odometer disclosure statements; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; modifying list of vehicles exempted from odometer disclosure statements; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02HouseApproved by Governor 05/02/2023
2023-04-26HouseSent to Governor
2023-04-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2023-04-26HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2023-04-25HouseReferred for enrollment
2023-04-25SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2023-04-25SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2023-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-04-04SenateReported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
2023-03-23SenateSecond Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
2023-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2023-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-22HouseAuthored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
2023-02-22HouseCR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Dobrinski
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2243 (Carry Over) 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2243&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2243%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2243%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2243%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2243%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB2243%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2243%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2243_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2243_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback