OK HB2215 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Mental health; community-based structured crisis centers; standards; adding certain exemptions for certified facilities for alcohol- and drug-dependent persons; effective date.
Title
Mental health; community-based structured crisis centers; standards; adding certain exemptions for certified facilities for alcohol- and drug-dependent persons; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Derby [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-12 | House | General Order |
2013-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Public Health Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Derby |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43A | 1 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 3 | 317 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 3 | 403 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 3 | 415 | New Code | See Bill Text |