OK HB2211 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
County commissioners; allowing chairman to designate certain person to serve in place of chairman; effective date.
Title
County commissioners; allowing chairman to designate certain person to serve in place of chairman; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Approved by Governor 04/09/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-04 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-04 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-03 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-03 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-03 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-03-28 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-02-15 | First Reading | |
2012-02-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-14 | General Order | |
2012-02-09 | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-09 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Peterson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |