OK HB2171 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Transportation finance; Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; effective date.
Title
Transportation finance; Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 51 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: C (Y: 42 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 51 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: C (Y: 42 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-18 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 18 | |
2011-05-18 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 29 Nays: 18 | |
2011-05-17 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Myers | |
2011-05-17 | Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 21 | |
2011-05-17 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-16 | Direct to Calendar | |
2011-05-13 | First Reading | |
2011-05-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-05-13 | Ayes: 46 Nays: 24 | |
2011-05-13 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2011-05-13 | Ayes: 47 Nays: 27 | |
2011-05-13 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2011-05-13 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears | |
2011-05-13 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 44 | |
2011-05-13 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears | |
2011-05-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 45 | |
2011-05-13 | Ayes: 42 Nays: 41 | |
2011-05-13 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-13 | General Order | |
2011-05-12 | JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-12 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-11 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jolley | |
2011-05-11 | Authored by Senator Myers (principal Senate author) | |
2011-05-11 | Authored by Representative Sears, Martin (Scott) | |
2011-05-11 | First Reading |