OK HB2171 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Property; establishing the Oklahoma Discretionary and Special Needs Trust Act. Effective date.
Title
Property; establishing the Oklahoma Discretionary and Special Needs Trust Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Anderson [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Rep. Mark McCullough [R] | Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-12 - House - House: (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-21 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-12 | CCR read | |
2010-05-12 | To Senate | |
2010-05-12 | Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-12 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-10 | Title restored | |
2010-05-10 | CCR submitted | |
2010-04-28 | HC's named: McCullough, Duncan, Sullivan, Sherrer, Rousselot | |
2010-04-19 | Conference granted, SCs named Anderson, Crain, Sykes, Corn | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-07 | SA's received | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Stanislawski, Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading | |
2010-02-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6 | |
2010-02-16 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-02-16 | General Order | |
2009-02-24 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative McCullough | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 175 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 86 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 87 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |