OK HB2169 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; enacting the Civil Liability for Employers Hiring Ex-Offenders Act; effective date.
Title
Labor; enacting the Civil Liability for Employers Hiring Ex-Offenders Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Title restored |
2015-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Sykes, Thompson, Treat, Dahm, Floyd, Sparks |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 23 |
2015-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative McCullough |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |