OK HB2149 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; creating the Agriculture Evidence and Law Enforcement Fund; authorizing agriculture law enforcement agents to enforce certain laws; including implement of husbandry in certain crime. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture; creating the Agriculture Evidence and Law Enforcement Fund; authorizing agriculture law enforcement agents to enforce certain laws; including implement of husbandry in certain crime. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by Governor 05/29/2009 | |
2009-05-21 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-21 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-21 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 | |
2009-05-20 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-19 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-19 | To Senate | |
2009-05-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-19 | Title restored | |
2009-05-19 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-06 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-05-06 | HC's named: Armes, DeWitt, Shoemake, Rousselot, Fields, Glenn, McPeak, McNiel, Richardson | |
2009-04-30 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-21 | SA's received | |
2009-04-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2009-04-20 | Title stricken | |
2009-04-20 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2009-03-30 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-04 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Armes | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 270 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 11 | 202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 4 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |