OK HB2134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2134
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; prohibiting disqualification of license for certain convictions; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; prohibiting disqualification of license for certain convictions; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Mike Osburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6 |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Munson |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2134 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism