OK HB2090 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2090
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; delivery service license; fee; requirements.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; delivery service license; fee; requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Lonnie Paxton [R] | Rep. Forrest Bennett [D] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Rep. Daniel Pae [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) McEntire |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) McDugle |
2024-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 34; Ayes: 51 Nays: 34 |
2024-02-15 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-15 | House | Amended |
2024-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, McEntire, Lawson, McDugle, Bennett |
2024-02-15 | House | General Order |
2023-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2090 (Carry Over) 2023-03-01 - CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee