OK HB2041 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2041
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; arrests and appearances before magistrates; authorizing the issuance of verbal warnings for misdemeanor arrest warrants; documentation; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; arrests and appearances before magistrates; authorizing the issuance of verbal warnings for misdemeanor arrest warrants; documentation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2023 |
2023-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-05-01 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 |
2023-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner |
2023-03-21 | House | General Order |
2023-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols |
2023-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Nichols |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2041 (Carry Over) 2023-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023