OK HB2009 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2009
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring the State Department of Education to annually publish certain report.
Title
Schools; requiring the State Department of Education to annually publish certain report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 61 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 25; Ayes: 53 Nays: 21 |
2018-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brecheen |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Smalley |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 29; Ayes: 68 Nays: 28 |
2018-03-14 | House | Amended |
2018-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-14 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | Emergency added |
2018-02-27 | House | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Rogers |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2018-02-26 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2009 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules