OK HB2008 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2008
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Education; creating the Dyslexia and Education Task Force to create certain handbook; effective date; emergency.
Title
Education; creating the Dyslexia and Education Task Force to create certain handbook; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/15/2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-08 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 5 |
2017-05-08 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's received |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Emergency added |
2017-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-03-08 | Senate | coauthored by Baker |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2017-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2008 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017