OK HB2008 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education; creating the Dyslexia and Education Task Force to create certain handbook; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; creating the Dyslexia and Education Task Force to create certain handbook; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HouseApproved by Governor 05/15/2017
2017-05-09HouseSent to Governor
2017-05-09SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-09HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-05-08HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-05-08HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 5
2017-05-08HouseSA's read, adopted
2017-05-01HouseSA's received
2017-05-01SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-27SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-27SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1
2017-04-27SenateEmergency added
2017-04-27SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-27SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2017-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2017-03-08Senatecoauthored by Baker
2017-03-08SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-08HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2017-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-21HouseAuthored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
2017-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Common Education
2017-02-13HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2008&Session=1700
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB2008%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB2008%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2008%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB2008%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB2008%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2008%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB2008%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2008_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB2008_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback