OK HB1980 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1980
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children; relating to the Uniform Parentage Act; adding exception to limitations of paternity actions; effective date.
Title
Children; relating to the Uniform Parentage Act; adding exception to limitations of paternity actions; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-21 | House | Remove Representative Jordan as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Josh) |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Jordan |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1980 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary