OK HB1972 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1972
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; load capacity violations; directing Corporation Commission to establish certain schedule; repealer.
Title
Motor vehicles; load capacity violations; directing Corporation Commission to establish certain schedule; repealer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Ford |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1972 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - Emergency clause stricken