OK HB1969 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to certain health savings accounts; making the creating of certain accounts optional; removing certain confirmation requirement; effective date.
Title
State government; relating to certain health savings accounts; making the creating of certain accounts optional; removing certain confirmation requirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Rep. Glen Mulready [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-12 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-11 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-11 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-11 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-11 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2011-03-14 | General Order | |
2011-03-02 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-02 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Mulready | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1375 | New Code | See Bill Text |