OK HB1911 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1911
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma State Board of Examiners for Long-Term Care Administrators; modifying requirements for members; effective date.
Title
Oklahoma State Board of Examiners for Long-Term Care Administrators; modifying requirements for members; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by Governor 05/13/2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-06 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-06 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Scott |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-19 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Boles, McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1911 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019