OK HB1904 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public health; abortion; physicians; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health; abortion; physicians; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseApproved by Governor 04/26/2021
2021-04-21HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-21SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-21HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-04-20HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-04-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Jett
2021-04-20SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
2021-04-20SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-04-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-03-29SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2021-03-03SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-03HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-02HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-02HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 19
2021-03-02HouseAuthored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
2021-03-02HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Martinez, Miller, Boatman, Caldwell (Trey), Steagall, Wolfley, Lawson, Echols, Manger, Conley
2021-03-02HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Mize, Townley, Stark, Dills, Hill, Hasenbeck, Nollan, Moore, Newton
2021-02-10HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Roe
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1904&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1904%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1904%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1904%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1904%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB1904%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB1904%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1904%20FULLAMD1%20CYNTHIA%20ROE-AB.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1904%20FULLAMD1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1904%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1904%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1904_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1904_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback