OK HB1904 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; certificates of titles; limiting modification; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; certificates of titles; limiting modification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2015-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Motion expired |
2015-05-20 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Proctor |
2015-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 36 |
2015-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2015-05-14 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Mazzei, Barrington, Newberry, Brinkley, Sykes, Sparks, Garrison |
2015-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2015-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Adoption of amendment rescinded |
2015-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended, considered and deferred |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6 |
2015-03-03 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Johnson |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |