OK HB1887 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1887
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Approved by Governor 04/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Approved by Governor 04/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Children; decreasing length of time minor shall live in prospective adoptive home in order for certain medical and social history to be disclosed; effective date.
Title
Children; decreasing length of time minor shall live in prospective adoptive home in order for certain medical and social history to be disclosed; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Approved by Governor 04/06/2017 |
2017-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-27 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Ownbey |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1887 (Carry Over) 2017-04-06 - Approved by Governor 04/06/2017