OK HB1855 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1855
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
State government; Legislative Service Bureau; authorizing and directing to enter into contracts for certain purposes; electronic filing of certain documents and reports; effective date.
Title
State government; Legislative Service Bureau; authorizing and directing to enter into contracts for certain purposes; electronic filing of certain documents and reports; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter |
2019-02-14 | House | Remove Representative Fetgatter as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hill |
2019-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1855 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter