OK HB1803 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Brecheen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; prohibiting expenditure of public monies for certain purposes relating to the Second Amendment of the United States Constitution; codification; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; prohibiting expenditure of public monies for certain purposes relating to the Second Amendment of the United States Constitution; codification; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-02HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Brecheen
2017-03-02HouseAuthored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
2017-03-02HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Coody, Bennett (John), Gann, Calvey
2017-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Public Safety
2017-02-21HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback