OK HB1802 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 24
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 24
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Corrections; authorizing use of electronic monitoring of inmates under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Corrections; authorizing use of electronic monitoring of inmates under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Rep. Marian Cooksey [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 24 | |
2011-04-26 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2011-04-26 | Title restored | |
2011-04-26 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-04-04 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2011-04-04 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6 | |
2011-03-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton, Ritze, Nollan, Roan, Cooksey | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Tibbs | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 991a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 38 | New Code | See Bill Text |