OK HB1793 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1793
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; modifying various provisions of the State Architectural and Registered Commercial Interior Designers Act; effective date; emergency.
Title
Professions and occupations; modifying various provisions of the State Architectural and Registered Commercial Interior Designers Act; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Osburn [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Nick Archer [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Archer |
2023-03-06 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1793 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed