OK HB1793 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1793

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Professions and occupations; modifying various provisions of the State Architectural and Registered Commercial Interior Designers Act; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; modifying various provisions of the State Architectural and Registered Commercial Interior Designers Act; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-10SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2023-03-23SenateSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2023-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
2023-03-06HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Archer
2023-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-22HouseAuthored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
2023-02-22HouseCR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Osburn
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1793 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback