OK HB1732 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust Fund; permitting funding for certain endowed chairs; effective date.
Title
Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust Fund; permitting funding for certain endowed chairs; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2015-05-19 | Senate | SCs named Fields, Treat, Jolley, Schulz, Sykes, Sparks, Garrison |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2015-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 16 |
2015-03-10 | House | Amended |
2015-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough |
2015-03-10 | House | General Order |
2015-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Montgomery |
2015-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |