OK HB1723 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; allowing municipal judges to carry firearms in courtrooms; clarify manner in which off-duty peace officers may carry firearms; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; allowing municipal judges to carry firearms in courtrooms; clarify manner in which off-duty peace officers may carry firearms; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2013-03-14 | House | Amended |
2013-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2013-03-14 | House | General Order |
2013-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2013-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |