OK HB1712 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; changing distribution of proceeds from the Oklahoma Education Lottery Trust Fund; creating the Common Education Lottery Revolving Fund; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; changing distribution of proceeds from the Oklahoma Education Lottery Trust Fund; creating the Common Education Lottery Revolving Fund; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Common Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Common Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | coauthored by Cox |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6 |
2013-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2013-03-11 | House | General Order |
2013-03-05 | House | Title stricken |
2013-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Thomsen |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |