OK HB1707 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Failed in Committee - Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Failed in Committee - Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Roads and bridges; relating to the Oklahoma Turnpike Authority; directing construction of on-and-off ramps in certain locations; effective date.
Title
Roads and bridges; relating to the Oklahoma Turnpike Authority; directing construction of on-and-off ramps in certain locations; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Transportation |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Kirby |
2014-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-04 | House | Remove Senator Paddack as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Stanislawski |
2014-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Rousselot |
2014-03-04 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-26 | House | Remove Representative Thomsen as principal House author and substitute with Representative Brumbaugh |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Thomsen |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |