OK HB1696 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; modifying the Oklahoma Charter Schools Act.
Title
Schools; modifying the Oklahoma Charter Schools Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Jolley; authored by Holt |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | House | Emergency not considered |
2015-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 32 |
2015-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-10 | House | Amended |
2015-03-10 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jordan |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2015-02-04 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Denney |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 134 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 135 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 137 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 140 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 142 | New Code | See Bill Text |