OK HB1686 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Railroads; creating the Eastern Flyer Passenger Rail Development Task Force.
Title
Railroads; creating the Eastern Flyer Passenger Rail Development Task Force.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Rep. Richard Morrissette [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Rep. Eric Proctor [D] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Sen. John Sparks [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | Approved by Governor 04/21/2011 | |
2011-04-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-14 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-14 | Motion expired | |
2011-04-11 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Crain | |
2011-04-11 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14 | |
2011-04-11 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 19 | |
2011-04-11 | coauthored by Sparks | |
2011-04-11 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-31 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2011-03-31 | coauthored by Shelton | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18 | |
2011-03-14 | Amended | |
2011-03-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Proctor, Pittman | |
2011-03-14 | General Order | |
2011-02-23 | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Morrissette | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |