OK HB1681 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1681
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State government; penalties for occupying a reserved space or failing to pay entrance fees; creating the Oklahoma Tourism, Parks, and Recreation Enhancement Act; establishing annual state park passes; effective dates; emergency.
Title
State government; penalties for occupying a reserved space or failing to pay entrance fees; creating the Oklahoma Tourism, Parks, and Recreation Enhancement Act; establishing annual state park passes; effective dates; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] | Rep. David Hardin [R] |
Rep. Jim Olsen [R] | Rep. Logan Phillips [R] | Rep. Tammy Townley [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Emergency added |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Stephens; authored by Senator Bullard |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Bullard |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Olsen |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Burns |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Townley |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 20 |
2021-03-08 | House | Amended |
2021-03-08 | House | House Rule suspended |
2021-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David), Fugate, Phillips |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Grego |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1681 (Carry Over) 2021-04-07 - Emergency added