OK HB1677 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; increasing assessment amount for persons convicted of certain offenses; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; increasing assessment amount for persons convicted of certain offenses; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Title stricken |
2013-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Blackwell |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |