OK HB1671 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1671
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; directing CLEET-certified officers to submit certain notification; effective date.
Title
Schools; directing CLEET-certified officers to submit certain notification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Approved by Governor 04/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-16 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Thomsen |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1671 (Carry Over) 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017