OK HB1669 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; authorizing use of cannabidiol for certain medical condition; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; authorizing use of cannabidiol for certain medical condition; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2017-03-21SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 8
2017-03-20HouseAuthored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
2017-03-20HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-15HouseCR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Thomsen
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632101New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback